AR HB1021 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1021 is now Act 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Regarding A Microbrewery-restaurant License; And To Authorize Certain Microbrewery-restaurant Licensees To Self-distribute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Regarding A Microbrewery-restaurant License; And To Authorize Certain Microbrewery-restaurant Licensees To Self-distribute.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06HouseNotification that HB1021 is now Act 207
2023-03-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-03-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-03-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-20SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-16HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-02HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2022-12-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1021&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1021.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1021%2FHB1021020220231004.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1021%2FHB1021021620231204.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=207.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1021-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1021-H2.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1021-DFA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1021-DFA2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1021&rcs=271&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1021&rcs=359&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback