AR HB1021 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The First-year Medical Student Scholarship Program Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The First-year Medical Student Scholarship Program Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-24SenateReceived from the House.
2021-02-24HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2020-12-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback