AR HB1015 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1015 is now Act 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1015 is now Act 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify Proper Procedures For Voting Precincts In Counties That Have Established Vote Centers.
Title
To Clarify Proper Procedures For Voting Precincts In Counties That Have Established Vote Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1015 is now Act 300 |
2017-02-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-02-20 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2016-11-21 | House | Filed |