AR HB1011 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Concerning Political Action Committee Contributions; And To Prohibit Direct Contributions Between Political Action Committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Concerning Political Action Committee Contributions; And To Prohibit Direct Contributions Between Political Action Committees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2017-01-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-11HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2016-11-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback