AR HB1007 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Notification that HB1007 is now Act 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Notification that HB1007 is now Act 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize Pharmacists To Dispense Hiv Preexposure And Postexposure Prophylaxis.
Title
To Authorize Pharmacists To Dispense Hiv Preexposure And Postexposure Prophylaxis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1007 is now Act 314 |
2023-03-17 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2023-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2022-11-18 | House | Filed |