AR HB1007 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Notification that HB1007 is now Act 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Protect Citizens Who Are Victims Of Judicial Ethics Violations; To Create A Cause Of Action Against Judges And Justices Who Have Been Convicted Of Certain Offenses; And To Create An Exception To Judicial Immunity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Protect Citizens Who Are Victims Of Judicial Ethics Violations; To Create A Cause Of Action Against Judges And Justices Who Have Been Convicted Of Certain Offenses; And To Create An Exception To Judicial Immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseNotification that HB1007 is now Act 430
2017-03-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-02HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-02SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2017-03-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-16SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-15HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
2017-02-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-03HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-11-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback