AR HB1004 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Democracy Act; To Require Automatic Voter Registration; And To Amend Amendment 51 Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Democracy Act; To Require Automatic Voter Registration; And To Amend Amendment 51 Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2017-03-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-02HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2016-11-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback