AR HB1001 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly 3rd Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Public School And School District Accountability System; To Provide A Pause In Current State Accountability Classifications; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Public School And School District Accountability System; To Provide A Pause In Current State Accountability Classifications; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23HouseNotification that HB1001 is now Act 21
2016-05-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-05-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-05-23HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-05-23SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2016-05-23SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2016-05-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2016-05-20SenateReceived from the House.
2016-05-20HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-05-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2016-05-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback