AR HB1001 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly 2nd Special

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 2 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2014-07-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2014-07-02HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2014-07-02SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2014-07-02SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-07-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-07-01SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2014-07-01SenateReceived from the House.
2014-07-01HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-07-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-07-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2014-07-01HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2014-07-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2014-06-30HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2014-06-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2014-06-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback