AL SB321 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hunting and fishing licenses, disabled, children under 21 further provided for, Sec. 9-11-54 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting and fishing licenses, disabled, children under 21 further provided for, Sec. 9-11-54 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HousePending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry
2016-04-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 638
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback