AL SJR97 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Campaign Practices Act, interim legis. committee estab. and an Alabama Bar Association study group, to study, evaluate, and recommend changes
Title
Fair Campaign Practices Act, interim legis. committee estab. and an Alabama Bar Association study group, to study, evaluate, and recommend changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Governor on May 10, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-358. | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Ball first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Received in House of Representatives | |
2012-05-09 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |