AL SJR9 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-231.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-231.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislature, Alabama Select Commission on High School Graduation and Student Dropouts, reestablished and extended
Title
Legislature, Alabama Select Commission on High School Graduation and Student Dropouts, reestablished and extended
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-231. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | House | McCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |