AL SJR87 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Poland, Charles Albert, Jr., Public School Bus Driver Appreciation Day, January 29, designated
Title
Poland, Charles Albert, Jr., Public School Bus Driver Appreciation Day, January 29, designated
Sponsors
Sen. Harri Smith [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-219. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | House | McCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-05-02 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |