AL SJR80 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Steel industry, importance recognized
Title
Steel industry, importance recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-157. |
2016-04-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-19 | House | McCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported from Rules |
2016-04-13 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |