AL SJR8 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Assigned Act No. 2017-19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Assigned Act No. 2017-19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Backpacks, school administrators urged to educate about potential health impacts of heavy backpacks, proactive measures to avoid injury
Title
Backpacks, school administrators urged to educate about potential health impacts of heavy backpacks, proactive measures to avoid injury
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-19. |
2017-02-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-02-21 | House | Boothe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Reported from Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |