AL SJR8 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Assigned Act No. 2010-133.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Assigned Act No. 2010-133.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Personnel Board, amendment to Rule 670-X-18-.01, entitled "Layoffs," disapproval by Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review, sustained
Title
State Personnel Board, amendment to Rule 670-X-18-.01, entitled "Layoffs," disapproval by Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review, sustained
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - Guin motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Bedford motion to again adopt, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Bedford motion to again adopt, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Assigned Act No. 2010-133. | |
2010-03-04 | Delivered to the Secretary of State | |
2010-03-04 | Returned to the Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Second House Concurs in Veto Override | |
2010-03-03 | Ward intended to vote "Yea" | |
2010-03-03 | Guin motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 487 | |
2010-03-03 | House of Origin Overrides Veto | |
2010-03-02 | Bedford motion to again adopt, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 419. | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Message | |
2010-03-02 | House of Origin Overrides Veto | |
2010-01-19 | Signature Requested | |
2010-01-19 | Enrolled | |
2010-01-19 | Passed Second House | |
2010-01-14 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced |