AL SJR76 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-424.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-424.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Excavation, One-Call Notification System Study Commission, created
Title
Excavation, One-Call Notification System Study Commission, created
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-424. |
2015-06-03 | House | Rules first Substitute Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-03 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-02 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-02 | House | Rules Substitute Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and |
2015-05-21 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |