AL SJR76 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Republic of China (Taiwan), commended
Title
Republic of China (Taiwan), commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Forwarded to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-24 | Assigned Act No. 2011-287. | |
2011-05-24 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-24 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-24 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-04-12 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2011-04-12 | Beason motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-12 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-04-07 | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |