AL SJR75 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mal Moore Memorial Highway, portion of United States Highway 29, named

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mal Moore Memorial Highway, portion of United States Highway 29, named

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20SenateDelivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013
2013-05-20SenateAssigned Act No. 2013-273.
2013-05-20SenateEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseSignature Requested
2013-05-20SenatePassed Second House
2013-05-20HouseMcCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-05-20HouseReported from Rules as Favorable
2013-05-02HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2013-05-02SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-05-02SenateReported from Rules
2013-04-18SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback