AL SJR64 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Forwarded to Governor on April 30, 2013 at 4:25 p.m. on April 30, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health, neuro-endocrine-immune diseases (NEIDs), Governor and health officials urged to establish clinical care and research center for, increased education of health care providers urged

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, neuro-endocrine-immune diseases (NEIDs), Governor and health officials urged to establish clinical care and research center for, increased education of health care providers urged

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-30SenateForwarded to Governor on April 30, 2013 at 4:25 p.m. on April 30, 2013
2013-04-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2013-171.
2013-04-30SenateEnrolled
2013-04-30HouseSignature Requested
2013-04-30SenatePassed Second House
2013-04-30HouseMcCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-30HouseReported from Rules
2013-04-23HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2013-04-18SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-18SenateReported from Rules
2013-04-09SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback