AL SJR58 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:08 p.m. on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:08 p.m. on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naming portion of U.S. Highway 78 West, Cleburne County, Horace and Mary Merrill Highway
Title
Naming portion of U.S. Highway 78 West, Cleburne County, Horace and Mary Merrill Highway
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Delivered to Governor at 3:08 p.m. on May 1, 2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Assigned Act No. 2012-284. | |
2012-05-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-01 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-01 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-19 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2012-04-19 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-19 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-03 | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |