AL SJR58 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on February 23, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on February 23, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
President Barack Obama urged to reverse his decision not to fully fund the Constellation project
Title
President Barack Obama urged to reverse his decision not to fully fund the Constellation project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on February 23, 2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned Act No. 2010-123. | |
2010-02-23 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-23 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-18 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-18 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-02-11 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-02-11 | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced |