AL SJR51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Act No. 2019-293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Act No. 2019-293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Greatest Save Teen PSA Program, commended
Title
The Greatest Save Teen PSA Program, commended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-293. |
2019-05-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 885 |
2019-05-22 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 817 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-07 | House | Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported from Rules |
2019-04-30 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |