AL SJR48 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Forwarded to Governor on February 25, 2010 at 10:45 a.m. on February 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Forwarded to Governor on February 25, 2010 at 10:45 a.m. on February 25, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Krebs, Thomas L., commended
Title
Krebs, Thomas L., commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Forwarded to Governor on February 25, 2010 at 10:45 a.m. on February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-140. | |
2010-02-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-23 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-02-04 | French motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-04 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced |