AL SJR4 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Forwarded to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pinhoti Trail, requesting Dept. of Transportation to place signs in Cleburne Co., for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pinhoti Trail, requesting Dept. of Transportation to place signs in Cleburne Co., for

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18SenateForwarded to Governor
2018-01-18HouseSignature Requested
2018-01-18SenateEnrolled
2018-01-16SenatePassed Second House
2018-01-16HouseJones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-16HouseReported from Rules
2018-01-11HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2018-01-11SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-11SenateReported from Rules
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback