AL SJR34 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on 2/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on 2/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislature, former members, issuance of identification cards authorized (2010-20294)
Title
Legislature, former members, issuance of identification cards authorized (2010-20294)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on 2/16/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned Act No. 2010-42. | |
2010-02-16 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-16 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-16 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-02-16 | Dixon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-16 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-02-11 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | Rules Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | Rules Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2010-02-02 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-02-02 | Dixon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced |