AL SJR33 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on March 29, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on March 29, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Brantley, William Frank, Jr., death mourned
Title
Brantley, William Frank, Jr., death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on March 29, 2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Assigned Act No. 2011-74. | |
2011-03-29 | Enrolled | |
2011-03-29 | Signature Requested | |
2011-03-29 | Passed Second House | |
2011-03-29 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-29 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Beason motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-24 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |