AL SJR3 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - Assigned Act No. 2016-454.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-23 - Assigned Act No. 2016-454.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental Protection Agency, urged to withdraw proposed rules regarding National Pollution Discharge Elimination System (NPDES)
Title
Environmental Protection Agency, urged to withdraw proposed rules regarding National Pollution Discharge Elimination System (NPDES)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-454. |
2016-08-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-08-23 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-08-19 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-19 | House | Johnson (R) Amendment Offered |
2016-08-19 | House | Received in House of Representatives |
2016-08-18 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-18 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt offered |
2016-08-18 | House | Reported from Rules and carried over |
2016-08-16 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |