AL SJR3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on March 8, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on March 8, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Military Veterans Memorial Bridge, crossing the Norfork-Southern Railroad in Woodstock, located on Coldwater Road (County Road 27) at the intersection of Eastern Valley Road in Bibb County, named
Title
The Military Veterans Memorial Bridge, crossing the Norfork-Southern Railroad in Woodstock, located on Coldwater Road (County Road 27) at the intersection of Eastern Valley Road in Bibb County, named
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on March 8, 2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned Act No. 2011-5. | |
2011-03-08 | Signature Requested | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled | |
2011-03-03 | Passed Second House | |
2011-03-03 | Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-01 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2011-03-01 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced |