AL SJR26 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Assigned Act No. 2017-56.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Assigned Act No. 2017-56.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
White, Thomas L., death mourned
Title
White, Thomas L., death mourned
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-56. |
2017-03-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-03-02 | House | Boothe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from Rules |
2017-02-28 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |