AL SJR22 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Moore, Hal, death mourned
Title
Moore, Hal, death mourned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-122. |
2017-03-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-03-15 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2017-02-16 | House | Boothe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-16 | House | Lovvorn Amendment Offered |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Rules |
2017-02-14 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |