AL SJR21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-12-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-28 - Delivered to Governor at 11:17 a.m. on February 28, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-12-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-28 - Delivered to Governor at 11:17 a.m. on February 28, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Childhood Cancer Awareness Month, September 2013, designated
Title
Childhood Cancer Awareness Month, September 2013, designated
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:17 a.m. on February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-40. |
2013-02-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-02-26 | House | McCutcheon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-12 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |