AL SJR15 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Assigned Act No. 2016-458.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bennett, Jim, death mourned

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bennett, Jim, death mourned

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-25SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-458.
2016-08-25HouseSignature Requested
2016-08-24SenateEnrolled
2016-08-24SenatePassed Second House
2016-08-23HouseJohnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-23HouseReported from Rules
2016-08-19HouseReceived in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2016-08-18SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-18SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback