AL SJR117 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 13, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 13, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cumberland School of Law, Trial Team, commended
Title
Cumberland School of Law, Trial Team, commended
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Bedford [D] | Sen. George Keahey [D] | Sen. Zeb Little [D] | Sen. Phil Poole [D] |
Sen. Hank Sanders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned Act No. 2010-460. | |
2010-04-13 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Guin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-25 | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules | |
2010-03-23 | Keahey motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced |