AL SJR103 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 1:52 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hartselle's Cotton Pickin' Barbeque Cook-Off, official State of Alabama Cookoff, designated

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hartselle's Cotton Pickin' Barbeque Cook-Off, official State of Alabama Cookoff, designated

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 1:52 p.m. on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-665.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Passed Second House
2011-06-09 Galliher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-06-09 Reported from Rules
2011-06-02 Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
2011-04-27 Orr motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-04-27 Introduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback