AL SB99 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military installations, land use planning, counties and municipalities to give notice re tall structures and wind energy facilities, Sec. 11-106-6 added; Secs. 11-106-3, 11-106-4 am'd.
Title
Military installations, land use planning, counties and municipalities to give notice re tall structures and wind energy facilities, Sec. 11-106-6 added; Secs. 11-106-3, 11-106-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered |
2020-02-27 | House | Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from County and Municipal Government with 1 amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 101 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |