AL SB99 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., occupational tax, levy prohibited, const. amend.
Title
Baldwin Co., occupational tax, levy prohibited, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Forwarded to Executive Department | |
2011-05-25 | Forwarded to Secretary of State on May 25, 2011 at 4:38 p.m. on May 25, 2011 | |
2011-05-25 | Assigned Act No. 2011-268. | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 855 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 537 | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |