AL SB98 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-53.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-53.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ad valorem taxes, co. commission authorized to abate taxes for Class III property taxed at current use when converted to other taxable use for projects under Ala. Jobs Act, consent of municipality if in corporate limits, Sec. 40-7-25.4 added
Title
Ad valorem taxes, co. commission authorized to abate taxes for Class III property taxed at current use when converted to other taxable use for projects under Ala. Jobs Act, consent of municipality if in corporate limits, Sec. 40-7-25.4 added
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-53. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-01-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-01-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 122 |
2018-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 32 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |