AL SB97 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Third Reading Open
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Third Reading Open
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Health Officer, order issued in response to outbreak of a disease has full force of law if approved by Governor and filed with Secretary of State in state of emergency, Sec. 11-47-132 repealed; Secs. 22-2-8, 31-9-8, 31-9-13 am'd.
Title
State Health Officer, order issued in response to outbreak of a disease has full force of law if approved by Governor and filed with Secretary of State in state of emergency, Sec. 11-47-132 repealed; Secs. 22-2-8, 31-9-8, 31-9-13 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Holmes motion to Adopt Roll Call 1200 (Y: 41 N: 44 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Reconsider Roll Call 1199 (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Holmes motion to Adopt Roll Call 1198 (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 721 (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 720 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate Roll Call 719 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 718 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Reconsider Roll Call 1199 (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - HBIR: Holmes motion to Adopt Roll Call 1198 (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 721 (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 720 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate Roll Call 719 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 718 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Open |
2021-05-17 | House | Health Substitute Offered |
2021-04-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 721 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 720 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 719 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Whatley first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB241 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 47 | 132 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 2 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 9 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 9 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |