AL SB97 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard, including national guard members from other states, rights to reemployment, Sec. 31-12-2 am'd.
Title
National Guard, including national guard members from other states, rights to reemployment, Sec. 31-12-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-258. |
2017-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 782 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 529 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |