AL SB96 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing, Board of, investigators granted power of peace officers, Act 2017-46, 2017 Reg. Sess.; Sec. 34-21-2 am'd.
Title
Nursing, Board of, investigators granted power of peace officers, Act 2017-46, 2017 Reg. Sess.; Sec. 34-21-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Health |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 776 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 775 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 774 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Health and Human Services Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |