AL SB95 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned Act No. 2017-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned Act No. 2017-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Real property, tax sales, excess funds, redemption payments, application to all funds held by a county, retroactive effect regardless of when tax sale occurred, Sec. 40-10-28 am'd.
Title
Real property, tax sales, excess funds, redemption payments, application to all funds held by a county, retroactive effect regardless of when tax sale occurred, Sec. 40-10-28 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-130. |
2017-03-14 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 228 |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 66 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 65 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |