AL SB95 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Spring Hill College, police officers, appointment, Sec. 16-22-1 am'd.
Title
Spring Hill College, police officers, appointment, Sec. 16-22-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:17 p.m. on May 7, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-191. |
2013-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1098 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 151 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 150 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |