AL SB94 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p.m. on May 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Literacy Act, third grade retention requirement postponed until 2024-2025 school year, Sec. 16-6G-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Literacy Act, third grade retention requirement postponed until 2024-2025 school year, Sec. 16-6G-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1224 (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Kitchens motion to Previous Question Roll Call 1223 (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Drummond motion to Table Roll Call 1222 (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 924 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 923 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 922 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateDelivered to Governor at 11:42 p.m. on May 17, 2021
2021-05-17HouseSignature Requested
2021-05-17SenateEnrolled
2021-05-17SenatePassed Second House
2021-05-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1224
2021-05-17HouseKitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1223
2021-05-17HouseDrummond motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1222
2021-05-17HouseCollins Amendment Offered
2021-05-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-05-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-04-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2021-04-13SenateEngrossed
2021-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 924
2021-04-13SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 923
2021-04-13SenateRoberts Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-03-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
166G5Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB94&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB94-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB94-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB94-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213178-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213908-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42139.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42906.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657414&VOTE=922&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB94&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657458&VOTE=923&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=657459&VOTE=924&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=665617&VOTE=1222&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=665618&VOTE=1223&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=665619&VOTE=1224&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback