AL SB94 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Physician agreements, not subject to regulation as insurance, license to sell or market not required, requirements for agreement established, discontinuance of services under the agreement, Ala. Physicians Direct Pay Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician agreements, not subject to regulation as insurance, license to sell or market not required, requirements for agreement established, discontinuance of services under the agreement, Ala. Physicians Direct Pay Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateEngrossed
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-460.
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-19HouseDaniels filed Conflict of Interest Declaration
2017-05-19HouseWeaver filed Conflict of Interst Declaration
2017-05-19HouseWeaver intended to vote "Abstain"
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1027
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
2017-04-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-09SenateEngrossed
2017-03-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 241
2017-03-07SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 240
2017-03-07SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2017-03-07SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-07SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2017-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-09SenateActed on by Health and Human Services as Favorable with 1 amendment
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB94&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB94-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB94-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB94-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/182047-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/182556-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=562384&VOTE=240&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=562385&VOTE=241&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579002&VOTE=1027&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback