AL SB94 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 8:35 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 8:35 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Funeral Service, Board of, substantially revised relating to board and operation of funeral establishments and mortuary service, application, renewal, and inspection fees increased, fines for violations increased, Secs. 34-13-1, 34-13-7, 34-13-9, 34-13-11, 34-13-12, 34-13-20, 34-13-22, 34-13-23, 34-13-26, 34-13-50, 34-13-51, 34-13-52, 34-13-53, 34-13-55, 34-13-56, 34-13-70, 34-13-72, 34-13-73, 34-13-74, 34-13-90, 34-13-94, 34-13-111, 34-13-113, 34-13-114, 34-13-115, 34-13-116, 34-13-120, 34-13-130 am'd.; Secs. 34-13-28, 34-13-150, 34-13-151, 34-13-152 repealed (2011-20128)
Title
Funeral Service, Board of, substantially revised relating to board and operation of funeral establishments and mortuary service, application, renewal, and inspection fees increased, fines for violations increased, Secs. 34-13-1, 34-13-7, 34-13-9, 34-13-11, 34-13-12, 34-13-20, 34-13-22, 34-13-23, 34-13-26, 34-13-50, 34-13-51, 34-13-52, 34-13-53, 34-13-55, 34-13-56, 34-13-70, 34-13-72, 34-13-73, 34-13-74, 34-13-90, 34-13-94, 34-13-111, 34-13-113, 34-13-114, 34-13-115, 34-13-116, 34-13-120, 34-13-130 am'd.; Secs. 34-13-28, 34-13-150, 34-13-151, 34-13-152 repealed (2011-20128)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 8:35 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-623. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1122 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-28 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433 | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 432 | |
2011-04-27 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |