AL SB93 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Assigned Act No. 2022-69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Assigned Act No. 2022-69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Medical Equipment, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2026.
Title
Home Medical Equipment, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2026.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 252 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Sanderford motion to Adopt Roll Call 251 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 112 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 111 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Sanderford motion to Adopt Roll Call 251 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 112 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 111 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-69. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 252 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 112 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |