AL SB92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-485.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-485.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Dept., inmate escapes, notification requirement to public expanded, Sec. 14-3-58 am'd.
Title
Corrections Dept., inmate escapes, notification requirement to public expanded, Sec. 14-3-58 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-485. |
2019-05-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1248 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 567 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |