AL SB92 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation, unemployment, to increase the possible weekly benefit, to lower weeks of unemployment benefits from 26 to 14 to 20 based on the unemployment rate in the recipient's county of residence, and to provide for additional benefits for persons undertaking job training or certification, Secs. 25-4-72, 25-4-74 am'd.
Title
Compensation, unemployment, to increase the possible weekly benefit, to lower weeks of unemployment benefits from 26 to 14 to 20 based on the unemployment rate in the recipient's county of residence, and to provide for additional benefits for persons undertaking job training or certification, Secs. 25-4-72, 25-4-74 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business with 1 substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 122 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 113 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |