AL SB90 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-327.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband Internet service, grants to provide minimum service to rural areas, definition of unserved areas, percentage of project costs eligible for funding increased, federal and state support as percent to project increased, Secs. 41-23-212, 41-23-213, 41-23-214 am'd.
Title
Broadband Internet service, grants to provide minimum service to rural areas, definition of unserved areas, percentage of project costs eligible for funding increased, federal and state support as percent to project increased, Secs. 41-23-212, 41-23-213, 41-23-214 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Shedd motion to Accede (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Shedd motion to Accede (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-327. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee on SB90 2019RS first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2019-05-30 | House | Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1166 |
2019-05-30 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1356 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Conference Report |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-05-30 | Senate | MESSAGE FROM THE HOUSE |
2019-05-29 | House | Shedd motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1141 House appoints Ledbetter, Grimsley and Shedd |
2019-05-29 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1268 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Marsh motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1265 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1110 |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1109 |
2019-05-28 | House | McCampbell Amendment Offered |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1108 |
2019-05-28 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 662 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |